KY HB19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 235.285 to require individuals born on or after January 1, 1975, to possess a safe boating certificate prior to operating a personal watercraft or motorboat on the waters of the Commonwealth; provide for exemption certificates; delay enforcement and require courtesy warnings for violations until July 1, 2023; amend KRS 235.990 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to boating safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-06-08 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/hb19.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/hb19/orig_bill.pdf |