KY HB185 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 16.505 to include in the definition of "dependent child," solely as it applies to a member who dies as a direct result of an act in line of duty or a duty-related injury, a disabled child of any age; define "monthly average pay" to mean the higher of a member's final rate of pay or average monthly creditable compensation earned during the deceased member's last 12 months of employment; amend KRS 16.601 and 61.621 to increase minimum act in line of duty or duty-related death benefits payable to the surviving spouse of a member of any of the systems administered by the Kentucky Retirement Systems from 25% to 75% of the deceased member's monthly average pay and, if there is no surviving spouse, to the dependent children at the rate of 50% for one dependent child, 65% for two dependent children, and 75% for three or more dependent children; amend KRS 61.510 to define "monthly average pay"; amend KRS 61.542 to provide that the surviving spouse shall supersede all previously designated beneficiaries in the case of line-of-duty death benefits payable from the systems administered by the Kentucky Retirement Systems unless the member files a valid beneficiary designation form after marriage to his or her spouse; amend KRS 61.702 to ensure full and timely hospital and medical insurance benefits for the spouse and dependents of a member who died as a direct result of an act in line of duty or duty-related injury; amend KRS 78.510 to define "monthly average pay"; provide that an eligible surviving spouse of a member who died as a result of an act line of duty or duty-related injury prior to the effective date of the Act shall receive the increased line of duty or duty-related death benefits; provide that a surviving spouse of a hazardous duty member who died as a result of an act in line of duty on or after January 1, 2017, who was ineligible for the minimum monthly death benefits because he or she was not named beneficiary shall be eligible for the benefits provided by this Act; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to death-in-line-of-duty benefits and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 445 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 656 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 350 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 151)
2018-04-02Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02HouseBill passed 91-0
2018-04-02HouseHouse concurred in Senate floor amendments (1) and (2)
2018-04-02Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (1) and (2)
2018-04-02Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-29Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2)
2018-03-29Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-27Senatefloor amendment (2) filed
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-22Senate1st reading
2018-03-22Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-21Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-03-21Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-20Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-19House3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-15Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-14Houseposted in committee
2018-03-14Houseposting waived
2018-01-17Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback