KY HB184 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.460 and 15.470 to provide that police officers receiving the Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program fund salary supplement shall continue to receive the supplement when called to active duty with the United States Armed Forces.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-06 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB184.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB184/bill.doc |