KY HB180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 39F.010 to define "veteran at risk"; amend KRS 39F.180 to add a veteran at risk to those included in a Golden Alert; allow any agency searching for a veteran at risk to refer to the Golden Alert as a Green Alert.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to veterans at risk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 72 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 99-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-02-15Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-07Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback