KY HB177 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 525.010 to define "adequate shelter" in regard to livestock and domestic animals other than livestock; amend KRS 525.130 to require persons having custody of an animal to provide adequate shelter and to clarify exceptions.
Title
AN ACT relating to cruelty to animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Hubert Collins [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] |
Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | recommitted to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | floor amendment (10) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (11) and (12-title) filed |
2015-02-27 | House | floor amendment (9) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-25 | House | floor amendments (5) and (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (6-title) and (7) filed to the bill |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | floor amendments (2) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) and (3) filed |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-09 | House | introduced in House |