KY HB175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 309.355 to authorize the board to require a national and state criminal background check of any applicant of licensure to practice massage therapy.
Title
AN ACT relating to massage therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2204 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 73 (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 73 (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 63) |
2022-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | received in House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 23, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-2 |
2022-01-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 28, 2022 |
2022-01-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |