KY HB168 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 6.601 to 6.849 to make it ethical misconduct for a legislator, legislative agent, or director of the Legislative Research Commission to intentionally engage in discrimination, harassment, or sexual harassment; define "discrimination," "harassment," and "sexual harassment"; declare that if a provision of KRS 6.601 to 6.849 is designated a misdemeanor or felony, an alleged violation of the provision may be adjudicated by the Legislative Ethics Commission as ethical misconduct; amend KRS 6.686 to allow dismissal of complaints by the Legislative Ethics Commission based upon an affirmative vote of at least 5 members at a regularly scheduled meeting or, upon written or oral notification by the chair, a teleconference meeting that the preliminary inquiry fails to state a claim of an ethics violation; allow complaints to be filed against former legislators, former legislative agents, and former employers of legislative agents for extended periods if they are related to discrimination, harassment, or sexual harassment; amend KRS 6.701 to include legislative branch employees in mandatory ethics education already required for legislators; amend KRS 6.711 to remove the requirement that orientation courses be designed to receive continuing legal education ethics credit; amend KRS 6.716 to require the Legislative Ethics Commission to administer a current issues seminar for legislative branch employees in addition to the existing requirement for legislators and to reduce the length of the current issues seminar for legislators from three to two hours; amend KRS 7.101 to require the Legislative Research Commission to coordinate the development and presentation of a training course regarding workplace harassment for legislators with the assistance of the Legislative Ethics Commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to legislative ethics.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Patti Minter [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Maria Sorolis [D] |
Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 55 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-31 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-0 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-01-30 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 31, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-27 | House | recommitted to State Government (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020 |
2020-01-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |