KY HB167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 39G to create the Kentucky Intelligence Fusion Center within the Kentucky Office of Homeland Security; amend KRS 39G.010 to require the executive director of the Kentucky Office of Homeland Security to administer the Kentucky Intelligence Fusion Center; amend KRS 61.878 to change the Office for Security Coordination to the Kentucky Office of Homeland Security; confirm Executive Order 2012-418.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 32) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | passed 96-0 |
2013-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-03-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-07 | Senate | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 |
2013-02-20 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |