KY HB166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 141)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 designating the last Wednesday in September of each year as A Day of Prayer for Kentucky's Students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to a day of prayer for students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1011 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 69 (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 141)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senatepassed 32-5
2019-03-14Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-28Senatefloor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed
2019-02-27Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 79-18
2019-02-13Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019
2019-02-13House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-02-05Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback