KY HB164 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 238.505 and 238.535 to include 501(c)(7) organizations created for recreational purposes in the types of organizations that may conduct charitable gaming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to charitable gaming.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 627 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 278 (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 84)
2018-03-27Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-27Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-22Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-22Housereceived in House
2018-03-22Senate3rd reading, passed 34-3
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-15Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2018-03-14Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-13House3rd reading, passed 59-36 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-07Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2018
2018-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-01-19Houseposted in committee
2018-01-11Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2018-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback