KY HB161 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 82)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 82)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 514.030 to increase the penalties for theft by unlawful taking or disposition of property valued at more than $500; repeal KRS 218A.1418.
Title
AN ACT relating to the criminal justice system.
Sponsors
Rep. Denver Butler [D] | Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] |
Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 82) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | passed 96-0 |
2013-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate committee amendment (1) |
2013-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1) |
2013-03-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with committee amendment (1) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with committee amendment (1) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (7) |
2013-02-26 | House | floor amendments (6) and (7) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (5) filed |
2013-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013 |
2013-02-25 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (3) and (4) filed |
2013-02-25 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-21 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-21 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-02-21 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | 1st reading |
2013-02-20 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-05 | House | introduced in House |