KY HB161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish that a candidate who has filed nomination papers on or before January 5, 2024, and whose precinct name or number has changed since November 8, 2023, due to reapportionment and precinct establishment shall not be disqualified based solely on precinct name or number designation; RETROACTIVE to November 8, 2023; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2860 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 9 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 9 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 1) |
2024-01-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-01-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-01-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-01-12 | House | received in House |
2024-01-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 11, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-09 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-01-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2024-01-08 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-08 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-01-08 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2024-01-08 | House | reassigned to State Government (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-01-05 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | 1st reading |
2024-01-04 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Elections and Voting
Retroactive Legislation
Secretary of State
State Agencies
Elections and Voting
Retroactive Legislation
Secretary of State
State Agencies