KY HB158 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 183.132 to allow a state university having an aviation degree track and also operating as a fixed-base operator to an airport governed by a local air board to submit for confirmation two additional members to the six-member board for a total of eight members and to provide for a contingency if all local governments withdraw their participation in the air board to allow a participating university to assume control of airport upon agreement with local governments and dissolution of the air board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to local air boards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 53 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22Senateto Transportation (S)
2021-02-09Senatereceived in Senate
2021-02-09House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2021-02-04Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2021-02-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021
2021-02-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Local Government (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback