KY HB156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 008)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 008)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.9-080 to exempt certain employees of insurers from the licensure requirement for insurance adjusters; amend KRS 304.9-430 to exempt certain employees of insurers from the licensure requirement for insurance adjusters; amend KRS 304.9-436 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 890 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 52 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 52 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 008) |
2019-03-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | reassigned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-01-11 | House | introduced in House |