KY HB155 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 386.454 relating to the Kentucky Principal and Income Act to permit a trustee to reallocate principal to income without court approval under named circumstances; amend KRS 386.450 to define "unitrust"; create new sections and amend sections of KRS Chapter 386 to create Kentucky "decanting" statutes to permit creation of a new trust; amend KRS 386.502 to clarify the effective date of the Kentucky Uniform Principal and Income Act; amend KRS 386.810 and 395.195 to permit trustee to deal with Medicare surtax issues; amend KRS 381.180 relating to spendthrift trusts to deal with Federal income tax and related issues; create new sections of KRS Chapter 387 to create a self-settled special needs "Pay Back" trust.
Title
AN ACT relating to the creation and administration of trusts and estates.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 59) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-30 | passed 92-0 | |
2012-03-30 | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) | |
2012-03-28 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-22 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-03-15 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-03-13 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-12 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-08 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 12, 2012 | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-07 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-05 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB155.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB155/bill.doc |