KY HB154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 013)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 013)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.286 to remove the requirement for golf carts to meet the federal safety standards for low-speed vehicles; establish new equipment standards for golf carts operating on roadways.
Title
AN ACT relating to standards for the operation of golf carts on roadways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 896 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 013) |
2019-03-05 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-01 | House | received in House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 85-8 |
2019-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-05 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-01-11 | House | introduced in House |