KY HB153 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 210 to establish the Kentucky Mental Health First Aid Training Program or similar program to be administered by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, subject to appropriation by the General Assembly or funding from other sources; list objectives of the training program; direct how grants are to be awarded; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the program; create the Kentucky Mental Health First Aid Training fund; require moneys from the fund to be used for the training program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mental health first aid training and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 264 (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa1 RSN# 1314 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 27 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-18Housepassed 82-1
2020-03-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-03-17Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-12Housereceived in House
2020-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-03-11Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-03-10Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020
2020-03-05Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-05Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-27Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-24Senatereceived in Senate
2020-01-23House3rd reading, passed 93-0
2020-01-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 23, 2020
2020-01-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-12-11HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback