KY HB152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 116.055 to permit members of political organizations and political groups to vote in primaries for nonpartisan races; amend KRS 117.035 to establish a process to select temporary replacements for a member of a county board of elections if a member is prohibited from serving, chooses not to serve, or cannot serve due to illness, injury, or other disability; amend KRS 117.045 to prohibit an election officer from being a candidate while serving as an election officer or from being an election officer in a precinct where the election officer has family members on the ballot; amend KRS 117.075 to give the clerk a three-day period to mail a requested absentee ballot to a voter; amend KRS 117.085 to clarify the procedures relating to absentee ballots; amend KRS 117.187 to require a county board of elections to include the elections and voting equipment security plan in the training provided to election officers and extend the training to special elections; amend KRS 117.265 to clarify the time for filing a declaration of intent; amend KRS 117.275 to specify procedures for handling return sheets and the records of voting equipment; amend KRS 117.295 to require that ballot boxes remain locked after voting; amend KRS 117.315 to add special elections to procedures relating to election challengers; amend KRS 117.355 to conform; amend KRS 118.425 to establish that the State Board of Elections count and tabulate the votes certified to the Secretary of State no later than the third Monday after the election; repeal KRS 117.285.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 176) | |
2010-04-15 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-15 | received in House | |
2010-04-15 | passed 35-0 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate receded from Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-04-15 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-04-15 | Free Conference Committee appointed in House | |
2010-04-14 | Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Free Conference Committee appointed in Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-04-14 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-04-01 | received in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-25 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) for Friday, March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-24 | received in House | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2010-03-22 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-19 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-18 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-16 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 98-1 | |
2010-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB152.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB152/bill.doc |