KY HB150 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 006)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 247.984 to change the name of the Surplus Agricultural Commodities Advisory Committee to the Farms to Foodbanks Advisory Committee; remove the requirement that the Advisory Committee annually review and update its written plan for the expenditure of funds; amend KRS 247.985 to change the reference from the Surplus Agricultural Commodities Advisory Committee to the Farms to Foodbanks Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Farms to Food Banks Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 441 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 28 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 006)
2018-02-20Housedelivered to Governor
2018-02-20Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-02-16Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-02-16Housereceived in House
2018-02-15Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0
2018-02-15Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 15, 2018
2018-02-14Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-13Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-22Senateto Agriculture (S)
2018-01-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-18House3rd reading, passed 90-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
2018-01-17Housefloor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
2018-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-08Houseto Agriculture (H)
2018-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback