KY HB148 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 172)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 381 to shift ownership of controlled substances from a deceased hospice patient to a hospice program so the hospice program may dispose of the controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prescription medications in hospice programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 750 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 501 (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 608 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 95 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-14Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 172)
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Senatereceived in House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 35-0
2018-04-14Houseveto overridden
2018-04-14Houseposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2018-04-14Houseto Rules (S)
2018-04-14Housereceived in Senate
2018-04-14SenateBill passed 82-3
2018-04-14Senateveto overridden
2018-04-14Senateposted for consideration of Governor's veto
2018-04-14Senatetaken from Rules (H)
2018-04-13Senateto Rules (H)
2018-04-13Senatereceived in House
2018-04-02Housevetoed
2018-03-22Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-22Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-22Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-22Housereceived in House
2018-03-21Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-03-20Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018
2018-03-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-08Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-07Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-06House3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-02-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 6, 2018
2018-02-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-01-30Houseposted in committee
2018-01-09Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-01-05Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback