KY HB147 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - recommitted to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-20 - recommitted to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.003 to include property valuation administrators within local governments' codes of ethics; require codes of ethics to include policy on employment of members of families of property valuation administrators, with exemption as to employees hired prior to effective date of Act; amend KRS 132.370 to provide that property valuation administrators are subject only to local governments' codes of ethics.
Title
AN ACT relating to governmental ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | recommitted to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB147.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB147/bill.doc |