KY HB146 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 341 to require the Office of Unemployment Insurance to advise a claimant approved for benefits of additional benefits, training opportunities, and financial aid resources available; amend KRS 341.005 to add training provided under the Trade Act of 1974 to the definition of approved training, and add disaster unemployment assistance and trade readjustment allowances to the programs not considered as enhanced benefits; amend KRS 341.100 create comprehensive list of conditions the secretary shall take into consideration when determining if work is suitable; amend KRS 341.385 to change the minimum state average unemployment rate from less than or equal to 4.5% to 6.5% and the minimum weeks of benefits available from 12 weeks to 16 weeks; remove claimants from the classification system with a definite return to work date or recall to work within a period of 16 weeks from the date of filing the initial or reopened claim, and removes extended benefits from benefits that shall not be affected by the classification system; amend KRS 341.375 to provide that notice the claimant declined to accept suitable work, or has failed to attend the first interview may not be the principal factor when determining ineligibility for benefits; amend KRS 341.4169 to provide workers shall not be denied shared work benefits if otherwise eligible when participating in training funded by the Workforce Innovation Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to unemployment insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 225 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2565 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 55 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2565 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 55 (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 80) |
2023-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-13 | House | passed 94-0 |
2023-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-09 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-08 | House | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | received in House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 08, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2023 |
2023-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-10 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Insurance
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workforce
Insurance
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
State Agencies
Unemployment Compensation
Wages and Hours
Workforce