KY HB145 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - discharge petition filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 438 to define terms; prohibit indoor smoking in businesses, places of employment, and other listed public places; exempt private residences, unless used for child care or adult day care; permit smoking in designated nonenclosed areas; require posting of "no smoking" signs at specified locations; permit local governments to adopt stricter regulations by ordinance; provide for enforcement by all peace officers and designated health department and local government employees; provide for the issuance of uniform citations for violations; require that employers and others not discriminate against persons reporting violations; provide for fines for violation; provide that fines go to the agency whose employee issued the citation; provide that no court costs or other fees be charged for violations; exempt certain research and manufacturing laboratories and agricultural buildings; amend KRS 344.040, relating to unlawful practices by an employer, to add reference to state law, local ordinance, or local board of health regulation relating to smoking; amend KRS 431.450, relating to uniform citations, to provide for issuing citation forms to health departments; authorize the Department of Kentucky State Police to create and issue uniform smoking violation citations; repeal various statutes permitting smoking in public buildings; provide that Sections 1 to 6 may be referred to as the Smokefree Kentucky Act.
Title
AN ACT prohibiting smoking in public places and places of employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | discharge petition filed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-13 | House | passed 51-46 with floor amendments (1) (10) and (13) |
2015-02-13 | House | floor amendments (5) and (12) defeated |
2015-02-13 | House | 3rd reading |
2015-02-12 | House | floor amendments (11) (12) (13) and (14) filed |
2015-02-11 | House | floor amendment (10) filed |
2015-02-11 | House | floor amendment (8) withdrawn |
2015-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-10 | House | floor amendments (6) (7) (8) and (9) filed |
2015-02-09 | House | floor amendments (3) (4) and (5) filed |
2015-02-06 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed |
2015-02-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-09 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | introduced in House |