KY HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 341.030 to suspend any increase in the taxable wage base for calendar year 2022 and utilize the taxable wage base in effect for the 2020 year; amend KRS 341.270 to indicate that employer contribution rates in 2022 shall be determined using the rates listed in Schedule A of Table A; amend KRS 341.614 to provide there will be no surcharge assessment for 2022; retroactively to January 1, 2022; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to unemployment insurance, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Webber [R] | Rep. Jonathan Dixon [R] | Rep. Daniel Elliott [R] | Rep. Chris Freeland [R] |
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 273 (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2082 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt sfa1 to W/scs1 RSN# 2081 (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 69 (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 2082 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt sfa1 to W/scs1 RSN# 2081 (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 69 (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 29) |
2022-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-14 | House | passed 88-5 |
2022-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-04 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-04 | House | received in House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | passed 29-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-01 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2022-02-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-4 |
2022-01-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-10 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Retroactive Legislation
Unemployment Compensation
Labor and Industry
Local Mandate
Retroactive Legislation
Unemployment Compensation