KY HB141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 173.450 to 173.650 to provide for the election of board members to public library districts; amend KRS 173.480 to remove references to appointment and integrate election protocols; create a new section of KRS 173.710 to 800 to provide for the election of board members to public library districts formed by petition; amend KRS 173.725 to remove references to appointment and integrate election protocols; amend KRS 173.650 to specify that the certification of election results other than for the election of library board members are certified by the county judge/executive in each county; amend KRS 118.305 to allow candidates for library boards to be placed on the ballot; amend KRS 118.315 to include candidates for library boards within nomination protocols for election; amend KRS 118.365 to allow candidates for library boards to be integrated with the petition of nomination process for elections; repeal KRS 173.490, relating to the boards of public library districts and KRS 173.730, relating to the boards of library districts formed by petition; establish that the terms of appointed board members expire upon the election and qualification of elected board members; EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2022
Title
AN ACT relating to the election of board members of library districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Counties
County Clerks
County Judges/Executive
Effective Dates, Delayed
Elections and Voting
Libraries
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Special Districts
State Agencies
County Clerks
County Judges/Executive
Effective Dates, Delayed
Elections and Voting
Libraries
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Special Districts
State Agencies