KY HB14 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-9)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section in KRS Chapter 132 to exempt veteran service organizations from ad valorem taxation if over 50 percent of the organization's annual net income is expended on behalf of veterans and other charitable causes; amend KRS 132.010 to define "veteran service organization"; apply to property assessed on or after January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to property taxes for veteran service organizations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04Houseposted in committee
2021-02-04Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2021-02-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-06-30HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback