KY HB139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 175)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 64.530 to provide for the reasonable compensation of county officers, employees, deputies, and assistants as fixed by the fiscal court.
Title
AN ACT relating to compensation of county officers and employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 175) | |
2010-04-15 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-15 | received in House | |
2010-04-15 | passed 38-0 | |
2010-04-15 | Senate receded from Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-15 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | received in Senate | |
2010-04-14 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | taken from Rules Committee | |
2010-04-14 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-04-14 | received in House | |
2010-04-14 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day | |
2010-04-14 | taken from committee | |
2010-04-14 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-04-14 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day | |
2010-04-01 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent bill with Committee Substitute | |
2010-04-01 | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-04-01 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2010-03-23 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-23 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-19 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-19 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-19 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-18 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-12 | 3rd reading, passed 77-15 | |
2010-02-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 12, 2010 | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB139.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB139/bill.doc |