KY HB138 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 100.217, relating to planning and zoning boards of adjustment, to allow for a joint board of adjustment to be appointed, and set out its membership parameters.
Title
AN ACT relating to boards of adjustment.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Koenig [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 668 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 70 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130) |
2018-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-29 | House | received in House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2018-01-29 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-17 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-08 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB138.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB138/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB138/vote_history.pdf |