KY HB136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create various new sections of KRS 218A to define terms and establish a medicinal cannabis program; create a new section of KRS Chapter 138 to establish an excise tax on certain transfers of medicinal cannabis; amend KRS 139.470 to exempt the sale of medical cannabis from the state sales tax; amend KRS 138.870 to exempt medicinal cannabis from the excise tax on controlled substances; amend KRS 216B.402 to require hospital emergency departments to report cases of cannabinoid hyperemesis syndrome to the Department for Public Health; amend KRS 218A.010, 218A.1421, 218A.1422, and 218A.1423 to conform; amend KRS 218A.202 to require the Department for Public Health to utilize the electronic system for monitoring controlled substances to monitor medicinal cannabis; amend 218A.500 to conform; amend KRS 342.815 to establish that the Employer’s Mutual Insurance Authority shall not be required to provide coverage to an employer if doing so would subject the authority to a violation of state or federal law; some sections EFFECTIVE July 1, 2023; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to medicinal cannabis and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 319 (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 59-34 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (2) (5) and (10) |
2022-03-16 | House | floor amendment (10) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | floor amendments (5) (6) (7) (8) and (9) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-14 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-11 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Cannabis
Corrections Impact
Disabilities and the Disabled
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Fiscal Note
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Licensing
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Substance Abuse
Taxation
Trade Practices and Retailing
Appropriations
Cannabis
Corrections Impact
Disabilities and the Disabled
Diseases
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Delayed
Federal Laws and Regulations
Fiscal Note
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Licensing
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Substance Abuse
Taxation
Trade Practices and Retailing