KY HB135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 145)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 109 to define “confidential business information” and to provide that no county or waste management district shall compel the production or submission of confidential business information from a solid waste management service company.
Title
AN ACT relating to solid waste management service companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3115 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 102 (Y: 20 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 102 (Y: 20 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 145) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-5 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-18 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 13, 2024 |
2024-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-01-30 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | introduced in House |