KY HB133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-28 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 149)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 132.017 to reduce the number of signatures required for a recall petition of a tax levy by a district board of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to recall petitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1708 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 162 (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-28Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 149)
2021-03-15Housedelivered to Governor
2021-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-03-12Housereceived in House
2021-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 28-6
2021-03-11Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021
2021-03-11Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2021-03-04Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-04Senate2nd reading
2021-03-04Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-03Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-03Senate1st reading
2021-03-03Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-03Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2021-03-02Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-03-02Senatereceived in Senate
2021-03-01House3rd reading, passed 72-21 with Committee Substitute
2021-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021
2021-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2021-02-09Houseposted in committee
2021-01-13Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-12-11HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback