KY HB133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-13 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 133.010, relating to property valuation, to define "personnel time"; amend KRS 133.020, 133.030, 133.040, 133.047, 133.120, 133.125, 133.160, 133.170, and 133.220 to correct references to the chief officers of local governments.
Title
AN ACT related to Property Valuation Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2015-02-09 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2015-02-09 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-06 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-08 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB133.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB133/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB133/vote_history.pdf |