KY HB130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 096)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 508.078 to include public gatherings, places of public accommodation, churches, and places of worship as places covered by the offense of terroristic threatening in the second degree; raise the penalty for terroristic threatening in the second degree to a Class C felony when the person engages in conduct to prepare for or carry out the threatened act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to terroristic threatening.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 993 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 143 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 096)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 35-2
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2019-03-01Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-02-25Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb130.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb130/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb130/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB130/HCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb130/HCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb130/HCS1LM.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB130/HFA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb130/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb130/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb130/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback