KY HB121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - returned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.17A-611 to prohibit insurers from setting requirements or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat opioid use disorder; amend KRS 205.536 to prohibit the Department for Medicaid Services or a Medicaid managed care organization from setting requirements or using certain utilization reviews for certain prescription drugs used to treat opioid use disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to prior authorizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 23 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13Senatereturned to Banking & Insurance (S)
2019-03-13Senate1st reading
2019-03-13Senatetaken from Banking & Insurance (S)
2019-02-14Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2019-02-12Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-11House3rd reading, passed 97-0
2019-02-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 11, 2019
2019-02-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-05Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback