KY HB118 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 006)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 335B to prohibit an occupational licensing authority from suspending or revoking a license it issued because the licensee is in default or delinquent on a student loan or work-conditional scholarship; define terms; encourage a person who is in default or delinquent in the payment of a student loan to contact the appropriate student loan servicer to establish a voluntary pay agreement for the student loan; state the goal of ensuring that individuals keep their occupational licenses while struggling to pay off student loan debt; designate a short title of "Keep Americans Working Act of 2019".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to occupational licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 889 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 48 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 006)
2019-03-01Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-01Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-01Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-02-28Housereceived in House
2019-02-28Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-15House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-13House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback