KY HB108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 099)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 099)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 394.300, relating to the recording of wills, to clarify that circuit clerks must copy and certify every will or authenticated copy admitted to the court for recording; require circuit clerks to send certified copies of wills, authenticated copies, and court orders admitting wills to probate to the county clerk for recording; clarify that the original will or authenticated copy shall remain with the circuit clerk for two years; repeal KRS 394.110.
Title
AN ACT relating to wills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 995 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 131 (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 131 (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 099) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-28 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | passed 89-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-22 | House | placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-02-22 | House | Vote on bill reconsidered |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |