KY HB107 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 45A to expand and refine the list of entities included in definition of "contracting body"; allow committee to determine the definition of "governmental emergency"; refine the definition of "memorandum of agreement"; correct references to universities and colleges and institutions of higher education; refine the definition of "personal service contract" to eliminate professional skill or judgment requirement and specifically include contracts for personal or professional services and group health care for public employees; allow the committee to establish reporting schedule for exempt personal service contracts and memoranda of agreement; exempt contracts between postsecondary institutions and health care providers, but require reporting of such contracts; require committee review of all personal service contracts and memoranda of agreement in excess of $1,000,000, except for contracts involving child support collections which are exempted; exempt contracts $40,000 and under from request for proposals process, but require three quotes when feasible, and determination of unfeasibility may be reviewed by the secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet or the committee; exempt contracts $40,000 and under not requiring professional skill or judgment from routine review process, but require filing within 30 days for informational purposes; prohibit delegation of decision-making authority by secretary of the Finance and Administration Cabinet, except with respect to institutions of higher education that have elected to implement procurement procedures in accordance with statutory authority; delete requirement for annual reports; delineate powers of the committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to government contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | vetoed | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | passed 94-1 | |
2011-03-04 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011 | |
2011-03-01 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-28 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-18 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 96-4 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-11 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-08 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to State Government (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB107.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB107/bill.doc |