KY HB106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 365 to define "affirmative consent," "automatic renewal," "automatic renewal offer terms," "clear and conspicuous," "continuous service," "continuous service offer terms," "gift membership," "gift subscription," "material change," "membership," "purchasing agreement," and "subscription"; require businesses to present automatic renewal or continuous service offer terms clearly and conspicuously to consumers before purchase; require businesses to obtain the consumer's consent before charging the consumer; require businesses to provide consumers with an easy-to-use mechanism for cancellation; require businesses to provide users who purchase in one medium the opportunity to terminate in the same medium, including online termination; require businesses to provide a notice regarding term changes prior to implementation; require businesses to abide by requirements before completion of the order, except that the acknowledment may be fulfilled after order completion and notice of change must be fulfilled prior to implementation; require businesses to provide notification of the expiration of a subscription; prohibit businesses from continuing to charge consumers after the completion of singular orders, orders for a definite period of time, or the expiration of subscriptions or memberships without creating an automatic renewal or continuous service; provide that goods, wares, merchandise, or products sent to the consumer shall be considered an unconditional gift if consent is not obtained by the business; amend KRS 365.990 to create penalty.
Title
AN ACT relating to the termination of automatic renewal offers and continuous service offers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 330 (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-12 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-14 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | 1st reading |
2022-03-14 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-03-11 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-12-06 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |