KY HB104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate the Corvette as the official state sports car of Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT designating the Corvette as the official state sports car of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim DeCesare [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 174) | |
2010-04-15 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-15 | received in House | |
2010-04-15 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-04-15 | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-25 | recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) | |
2010-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-05 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB104.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB104/bill.doc |