KY HB103 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164A.055 to redefine "board"; establish the Asset Resolution Corporation as an independent de jure municipal corporation and political subdivision; authorize the retention and compensation of employees; empower the corporation to serve and support schools or students concerning student finances, postsecondary education, and workforce development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Asset Resolution Corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-09Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-11-18HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback