KY HB101 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - to Families & Children (S)
Pending: Senate Families & Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - to Families & Children (S)
Pending: Senate Families & Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.160 to prohibit administrative regulations of the Kentucky Board of Education from requiring students to receive the COVID-19 vaccine in order to attend school.
Title
AN ACT relating to student COVID-19 vaccine requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 148 (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | 1st reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 79-17 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 07, 2023 |
2023-03-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-17 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2023-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Health and Medical Services
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Health and Medical Services