KY HB101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 510.020 to state that a 16 or 17-year old is incapable of consent when the actor is 28 years old or more; amend KRS 510.030 to add lack of knowledge of the victim's age being 16 or 17 when the offender was at least 28 years old at the time of the offense as a defense; amend KRS 510.060 to add to rape in the third degree a person who is 28 years old or more that has sexual intercourse with a 16 or 17-year old; amend KRS 510.090 to add to sodomy in the third degree a person who is 28 years old or more that has deviate sexual intercourse with a 16 or 17-year old; provide that this Act may be cited as Jenna's Law.
Title
AN ACT relating to crimes and punishments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. Chris Fugate [R] |
Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Angie Hatton [D] | Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] |
Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Steve Riley [R] |
Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Diane St Onge [R] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] | Rep. Russell Webber [R] |
Rep. Jill York [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 346 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 535 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 535 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 32 (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 43) |
2018-03-20 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-20 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-19 | House | passed 89-0 |
2018-03-19 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-15 | House | received in House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2018-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-5 |
2018-01-17 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-01-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-04 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |