KY HB100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to define "vintage distilled spirits"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to regulate the selling and reselling of vintage distilled spirits; amend KRS 243.0305 to allow distillers to sell at fairs, festivals, and similar events; amend KRS 243.480 to change penalties applying to retail sales and to other violations; amend KRS 244.370 to apply Kentucky whiskey requirements to whiskey produced from grains that are cooked, fermented, and distilled in Kentucky; Sections 1 and 2 EFFECTIVE January 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to distilled spirits.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] | Rep. James Kay [D] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] |
Rep. Jason Nemes [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Diane St Onge [R] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 59) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 57-25 with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | introduced in House |