KS SR1705 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Senate Enrolled on Monday, February 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Senate Enrolled on Monday, February 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the permanent rules of the Senate for the 2021-2024 term.
Title
Adopting the permanent rules of the Senate for the 2021-2024 term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 3 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled on Monday, February 1, 2021 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 3 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hawk was rejected |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hawk |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |