KS SCR1623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-5)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the President of the United States to stop importing oil and gas from Russia.
Title
Urging the President of the United States to stop importing oil and gas from Russia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2022-03-16 | House | House Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-16 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |