KS SCR1613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - House Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 80 Nay: 43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the bill of rights of the constitution of the state of Kansas to reserve to the people the right to regulate abortion through their elected state representatives and senators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House Final Action - Not adopted - Yea: 80 Nay: 43 (Y: 80 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted - Yea: 80 Nay: 41 (Y: 80 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended by Required 2/3 Majority - Yea: 28 Nay: 12 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 28 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 26 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected - Yea: 12 Nay: 28 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 29 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 29 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected - Yea: 13 Nay: 27 (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HouseHouse Final Action - Not adopted by required 2/3 majority; Yea: 80 Nay: 43
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted Yea: 80 Nay: 41
2020-02-06HouseHouse Representative Humphries raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Garber
2020-01-30HouseHouse Referred to Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-01-29SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended by Required 2/3 Majority; Yea: 28 Nay: 12
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 28
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 26
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was rejected Yea: 12 Nay: 28
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 29
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Miller
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was rejected
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Miller
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Miller was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 29
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Miller
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 27
2020-01-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll
2020-01-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-21SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 21, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2020-01-16SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/scr1613/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/scr1613_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/scr1613_01_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129170720_853539/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129180150_696714/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129183122_284705/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129192515_238303/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129193319_874480/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129195252_103713/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200129202717_560995/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200206111237_496015/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20200207160744_542471/

Bill Comments

feedback