KS SCR1606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the reproductive health act of New York.
Title
Condemning the reproductive health act of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 85 Nay: 38 (Y: 85 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson. Rep. Barker raised a question of germaneness; The amendment was ruled not germane. Rep. Benson challenged the ruling of the chair; the ruling was sustained. - Y (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted - Yea: 78 Nay: 5 (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 32 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 79 Nay: 34 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson. Rep. Barker raised a question of germaneness; The amendment was ruled not germane. Rep. Benson challenged the ruling of the chair; the ruling was sustained. - Y (Y: 80 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted - Yea: 78 Nay: 5 (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 32 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained - Yea: 79 Nay: 34 (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 37 Nay: 81 (Y: 37 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 85 Nay: 38 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted Yea: 78 Nay: 5 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2019-03-12 | House | House Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge. Rep. Barker raised a question of germaneness; The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained Yea: 79 Nay: 34 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Representative Awerkamp raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2019-03-12 | House | House Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala |
2019-03-12 | House | House Representative Barker raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane. |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward. Rep. Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Handwritten Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson. Rep. Barker raised a question of germaneness; The amendment was ruled not germane. Rep. Benson challenged the ruling of the chair; the ruling was sustained. Yea: 80 Nay: 37 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 81 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2019-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-15 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-15 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 13 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |