KS SCR1605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Wednesday, April 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; reapportionment, deleting requirement for adjustment of census data for military personnel and students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; reapportionment, deleting requirement for adjustment of census data for military personnel and students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 117 Nay: 7 (Y: 117 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Wednesday, April 3, 2019
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 117 Nay: 7
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2019-03-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Elections
2019-03-21HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-03-15HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Elections
2019-03-15HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-14SenateSenate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-02-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections, and Local Government
2019-02-06SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback