KS SB97 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the extent of property tax exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy.
Title
Increasing the extent of property tax exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Introduced |