KS SB94 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a minimum course duration for motor vehicle accident prevention courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a minimum course duration for motor vehicle accident prevention courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 4 (Y: 120 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-28HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-28HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-25SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-06SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-05SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback